EP2896978 - Microstructured optical fibre, composite structure, method and use for measuring shear load in a composite structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vrije Universiteit Brussel VUB Pleinlaan, 2 1050 Brussels / BE | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thienpont, Hugo Frankrijstraat 10 1755 Gooik / BE | 02 /
Geernaert, Thomas Kuitelgen 38 9255 Buggenhout / BE | 03 /
Berghmans, Francis Reigerstraat 23 2260 Westerloo / BE | 04 /
Sulejmani, Sanne Hogeschoollaan 101 Bus 3 1050 Elsene / BE | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Kirkpatrick Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | Application number, filing date | 14151672.4 | 17.01.2014 | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896978 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/024 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
G02B6/02357 (EP,US);
G01D5/3538 (EP,US);
G01L1/242 (US);
G02B6/02109 (EP,US);
G02B6/02338 (EP,US);
G02B6/02352 (US);
G02B2006/12138 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mikrostrukturierte optische Faser, Verbundstruktur, Verfahren und Verwendung zur Messung der Scherbelastung in einer Verbundstruktur | [2015/30] | English: | Microstructured optical fibre, composite structure, method and use for measuring shear load in a composite structure | [2015/30] | French: | Fibre optique microstructurée, structure composite, procédé et utilisation de mesure de charge de cisaillement dans une structure composite | [2015/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO0239159 (CRYSTAL FIBRE AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-6,11 * page 33, line 27 - page 34, line 22; figure 23 * [A] 7 [Y] 1-6,8-15; | [YD]WO2011061309 (UNIV BRUXELLES [BE], et al) [YD] 8-10 * page 14, line 13 - page 15, line 1 *; | [YA]US2006197012 (UDD ERIC [US], et al) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032]; figures 6,7 * [A] 7 | [YDA] - MARCIN SZPULAK ET AL, "Highly Birefringent Photonic Crystal Fibre with Enhanced Sensitivity to Hydrostatic Pressure", TRANSPARENT OPTICAL NETWORKS, 2006 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20060601), ISBN 978-1-4244-0235-9, pages 174 - 177, XP031018221 [YD] 1-6,8-15 * page 174, paragraph 1 - page 176, paragraph 2; figures 1c,1d,2,3 * [A] 7 | [Y] - LUYCKX G ET AL, "Response of FBGs in Microstructured and Bow Tie Fibers Embedded in Laminated Composite", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090905), vol. 21, no. 18, doi:10.1109/LPT.2009.2025262, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 1290 - 1292, XP011269869 [Y] 10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2009.2025262 | [Y] - THOMAS GEERNAERT ET AL, "Transversal Load Sensing With Fiber Bragg Gratings in Microstructured Optical Fibers", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090101), vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 6 - 8, XP011240936 [Y] 10 * abstract * | [YDA] - SULEJMANI ET AL., "Shear stress sensing with Bragg grating-based sensors in microstructured optical fibers", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20130822), vol. 21, no. 17, pages 20404 - 20416, XP002722725 [YD] 10,12-15 * the whole document * [A] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.21.020404 | [YA] - GEERNAERT T ET AL, "Fiber Bragg Gratings in Germanium-Doped Highly Birefringent Microstructured Optical Fibers", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080415), vol. 20, no. 8, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 554 - 556, XP011206009 [Y] 10 * abstract * [A] 7 | [YDA] - SONNENFELD ET AL., "Microstructured Optical Fiber Sensors Embedded in a Laminate Composite for Smart Material Applications", SENSORS, (20110228), vol. 11, pages 2566 - 2579, XP002722726 [YD] 10 * abstract * [A] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/0.3390/s110302566 | [YA] - WOJCIK J ET AL, "Technology of high birefringent photonic crystal fibers for sensing applications", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, S P I E - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, US, vol. 6189, doi:10.1117/12.664823, ISSN 0277-786X, (20060423), pages 618902 - 1, (20060422), XP002594882 [Y] 10 * abstract * [A] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.664823 | [YA] - YAN C ET AL, "Development of flexible pressure sensing polymer foils based on embedded fibre Bragg grating sensors", PROCEDIA ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 5, doi:10.1016/J.PROENG.2010.09.100, ISSN 1877-7058, (20100101), pages 272 - 275, (20101025), XP027483656 [Y] 10 * abstract * [A] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.proeng.2010.09.100 | [A] - NORIMOTO KAWANISHI ET AL, "Henpa hoji kino o yusuru kuko hikari fiber", INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS TSUSHIN SOCIETY TAIKAI KOEN RONBUNSHUU, XX, XX, (20000907), page 376, XP002963497 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [YA] - JIN ET AL., "Progress Towards an Orrthogonal Strain State Sensor Based Optical Fiber Technology", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (19990301), vol. 3670, pages 516 - 531, XP002722727 [Y] 12-15 * page 517, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 524, paragraph 3 - page 526, paragraph 3; figures 1,4-7 * [A] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.349765 | [YA] - HESSKE A ET AL, "Preliminary results of an experimental verification of shear strain influence on fibre Bragg grating reflection spectra", PHOTONICS 2010: TENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FIBER OPTICS AND PHOTONICS, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20101229), vol. 8173, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.897911, pages 1 - 7, XP060016307 [Y] 12,13,15 * pages 8173Y-2, paragraph 4 - pages 8173Y-6, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * [A] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.897911 | by applicant | WO2011061309 | - SZPULAK M. ET AL., "Highly Birefringent Photonic Crystal Fibre with Enhanced Sensitivity to Hydrostatic Pressure", ICTON 2006, PROCEEDINGS, (2006), pages 174 - 177 | - GEERNAERT T ET AL., JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, (20100515), vol. 28, no. 10 | - SULEJMANI S. ET AL., "Shear stress sensing with Bragg grating-based sensors in microstructured optical fibers", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20130822), page 20404 |