EP2781978 - A method for automatically determining a finishing recipe of a manufactured component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AV&R Vision and Robotics Inc. 269, rue Prince Montreal QC H3C 2N4 / CA | [2016/45] |
Former [2016/44] | For all designated states AV & R VISION & ROBOTIQUES Inc. 269 rue Prince Montréal, QC H3C 2N4 / CA | ||
For all designated states Robotics Inc. 269, rue Prince Montreal, Québec H3C 2N4 / CA | |||
Former [2014/39] | For all designated states AV&R Vision 269, rue Prince Montreal, Québec H3C 2N4 / CA | ||
For all designated states Robotics Inc. 269, rue Prince Montreal, Québec H3C 2N4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arrien, Francois-Imran 5370 Saint-Ignatius Montreal, H4V 2C4 / CA | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Wittmann, Günther Patentanwaltskanzlei Wittmann Frans-Hals-Straße 31 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Wittmann, Günther Wittmann Hernandez Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frans-Hals-Strasse 31 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14151709.4 | 20.01.2014 | [2014/39] | Priority number, date | US201313847014 | 19.03.2013 Original published format: US201313847014 | [2014/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2781978 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2781978 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2781978 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4099 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
G05B19/4099 (EP,US);
G06F30/00 (US);
G05B2219/35098 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35167 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45147 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2014/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Ermittlung eines Fertigstellungsrezepts einer hergestellten Komponente | [2014/39] | English: | A method for automatically determining a finishing recipe of a manufactured component | [2014/39] | French: | Procédé de détermination automatique d'une recette de finition d'un composant fabriqué | [2014/39] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 01.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2016 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2014 | AL | 06.01.2016 | AT | 06.01.2016 | BE | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | RS | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | SM | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | IE | 20.01.2016 | LU | 20.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.01.2014 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.01.2016 | ||
LU | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.01.2014 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | BE | 31.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004083024 (WANG WEIPING [US]) [X] 1-3* the whole document *; | [X]EP2070641 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2009319077 (CAMERON MITCHEL [GB]) [X] 1-6,8-12,14 * the whole document * [A] 7,13; | [XA]US2012077417 (DERRIEN GERARD [FR], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 7,13; | [X]US2012124834 (CHOLET STEPHANE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2013035781 (CAMERON MITCHEL [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-12,15 * the whole document * [A] 7,8,13,14 |