Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10336418 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2019 | B2 | US2017066516 | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615353838 | 17.11.2016 | JP2013009284 | 22.01.2013 | US201414159629 | 21.01.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9840314 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2017 | B2 | US2014205455 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013009284 | 22.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5979018B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2016 | B2 | JP2014141120 | 07.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013009284 | 22.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103935503B | Global Dossier | 18.07.2017 | B | CN103935503 | 23.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013009284 | 22.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2757038 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2019 | B1 | EP2757038 | 28.02.2018 | A3 | EP2757038 | 23.07.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2013009284 | 22.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI519720B | 01.02.2016 | B | TW201430236 | 01.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013009284 | 22.01.2013 |