EP2896371 - Computer aided diagnosis for detecting abdominal bleeding with 3D ultrasound imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Her Majesty The Queen, In Right Of Canada, As Represented by the Minister of National Defence 305 Rideau Street Ottawa, ON K1A 0K2 / CA | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stergiopoulos, Stergios 45 York Mills Road Suite 103 TORONTO, Ontario ON M2P 1B6 / CA | 02 /
Shek, Pang 180 Harlandale Avenue TORONTO, Ontario ON M2N 1P4 / CA | 03 /
Plataniotis, Konstantinos 560 Glencairn Avenue TORONTO, Ontario ON M6B 1Z4 / CA | 04 /
Marsousi, Mahdi 3 Pembleton Avenue Apartment 507 TORONTO, Ontario ON M2M 4M1 / CA | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 3, impasse de la Vigie CS 71840 35418 Saint-Malo Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14151886.0 | 21.01.2014 | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896371 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, G06T5/00, G06T7/00, A61B8/00 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
A61B8/085 (EP);
A61B8/5223 (EP);
G06T7/12 (EP);
G06T7/149 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B8/4427 (EP);
A61B8/483 (EP);
A61B8/5269 (EP);
G06T2207/10136 (EP);
G06T2207/20101 (EP);
G06T2207/20116 (EP);
G06T2207/30056 (EP);
G06T2207/30084 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Computergestützte Diagnose zur Erkennung von Abdominalblutung mit 3D-Ultraschallbildgebung | [2015/30] | English: | Computer aided diagnosis for detecting abdominal bleeding with 3D ultrasound imaging | [2015/30] | French: | Diagnostic assisté par ordinateur pour la détection de saignement abdominal avec imagerie par ultrasons à 3D | [2015/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004024315 (CHALANA VIKRAM [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8-10,14,15 * abstract * * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0073] * [I] 2-4,11-13; | [A]US2008267468 (GEIGER PAUL [CA], et al) [A] 2,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] *; | [A]US2008139938 (YANG FUXING [US], et al) [A] 3,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0089] * | [X] - MARSOUSI M ET AL, "A multi-steps segmentation approach for 3D ultrasound images using the combination of 3D-Snake and Level-Set", 2013 18TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING (DSP), IEEE, doi:10.1109/ICDSP.2013.6622693, ISSN 1546-1874, (20130702), pages 1 - 4, (20131006), XP032498435 [X] 1,5-7,10,14,15 * abstract * * figure 2 * * Sections I. and II. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDSP.2013.6622693 | by applicant | US7920731 | US7803116 | US8520947 | US6561980 | US6385332 | US6719696 | US6482160 | - B. J. C.; D. C., "Adaptive filtering for reduction of speckle in ultrasound pulse-echo images", ULTRASONICS, (1986), vol. 1, pages 41 - 44 | - G. A, G. J., M. S.; C. K. DEEPIKA, "De-speckling of Medical Ultrasound Images using Wiener Filter and Wavelet Transform", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY, (2011), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 21 - 24 | - L. T., M. W. N.; A. P. L., "An adaptive weighted median filter for speckle suppression in medical ultrasonic images", IEEE TRANSACTION ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, (1989), vol. 36, pages 129 - 135 | - P. TAYA; S. T. ACTON; J. A. HOSSACK, "A wavelet thresholding method to reduce ultrasound artifacts", COMPUTERIZED MEDICAL IMAGING AND GRAPHICS, (2011), vol. 35, pages 42 - 50 | - Y. YU; S. ACTON, "Speckle reducing anisotropic diffusion", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (2002), vol. 11, no. 11, pages 1260 - 1270 | - S. KALAIVANI; R. WAHIDABANU, "Condensed anisotropic diffusion for speckle reducton and enhancement in ultrasonography", EURASIP JOURNAL ON IMAGE AND VIDEO PROCESSING, (2012), vol. 2012, no. 12, pages 1 - 17 | - B. BURGETH; S. DIDAS; L. FLORACK; J. WEICKERT, "A generic approach to diffusion filtering of matrix-fields", COMPUTING, (2007), vol. 81, no. 2, pages 179 - 197 | - P. C. TAY; C. D. GARSON; S. T. ACTON; J. A. HOSSACK, "Ultrasound Despeckling for Contrast Enhancement", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (2010), vol. 19, no. 7, pages 1847 - 1860 | - R. RUBINSTEIN; M. ZIBULEVSKY; M. ELAD, "Double sparsity: learning sparse dictionaries for sparse signal approximation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (2010), vol. 58, no. 3, page 1553 | - A. BELAID; D. BOUKERROUI; Y. MAINGOURD; J. F. LERALLUT, "Phase-Based Level Set Segmentation of Ultrasound Images", INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY IN BIOMEDICINE, IEEE TRANSACTIONS, (2011), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 138 - 147 | - R. J. SCHNEIDER; D. P. PERRIN; N. V. VASILYEV; G. R. MARX; P. J. D. NIDO; R. D. HOWE, "Mitral Annulus Segmentation From 3D Ultrasound Using Graph Cuts", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, (2010), vol. 29, no. 9, pages 1676 - 1687 | - R. SHEKHAR; R. M. COTHREN; D. G. VINCE; S. CHANDRA; J. D. THOMAS; J. F. CORNHILL, "Three-dimensional segmentation of luminal and adventitial borders in serial intravascular ultrasound images", COMPUTERIZED MEDICAL IMAGING AND GRAPHICS, (1999), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 299 - 309 | - R. WHITAKER, "A Level-Set Approach to 3D Reconstruction from Range Data", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, (1998), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 203 - 231 | - K. MARDIA; T. J. HAINSWORTH, "A spatial thresholding method for image segmentation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (1988), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 919 - 927 | - L. ITTI; C. KOCH; E. NIEBUR, "A Model of Saliency-Based Visual Attention for Rapid Scene Analysis", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (1998), vol. 20, no. 11, pages 1254 - 1259 | - A. YEZZI; S. SOATTO, "Deformotion: Deforming motion, shape average and the joint registration and approximation of structures in images", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, (2003), vol. 53, pages 153 - 167 | - M. R.; J. A. SETHIAN; B. C. VEMURI, "Shape modeling with front propagation: a level set approach", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (1995), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 158 - 175 | - REVOL; M. JOURLIN, "A new minimum variance region growing algorithm for image segmentation", PATTERN RECOGNITION LETTERS, (1997), vol. 18, pages 249 - 258 | - P. SOILLE, MORPHOLOGICAL IMAGE ANALYSIS: PRINCIPLES AND APPLICATIONS, (1999), pages 173 - 174 | - A. B. WATSON, "Image compression using the Discrete Cosine Transform", MATHEMATICA JOUNRAL, (1994), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 81 - 88 | - Y. C. PATI, R. R.; K. P. S., "Orthogonal Matching Pursuit: recursive function approximation with applications to wavelet decomposition", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE TWENTY-SEVENTH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, (1993), vol. 1, pages 40 - 44 | - D. E. LLOYD, "Automatic target classification using moment variants of iamge shapes", FRANBOROUGH, UK, REP. RAE IDN AW, (1985), page 126 | - D. TERZOPOULOS; A. WITKIN; M. KASS, "Constrains on deformable models: recovering 3d shape and nonrigid motion", ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, (1988), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 91 - 123 | - M. AHERON; M. ELAD; A. BRUCKSTEIN, "K-SVD: An Algorithm for Designing Overcomplete Dictionaries for Sparse Representation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (2006), vol. 54, no. 12, pages 4311 - 4322 | - C. KOCH; S. ULMAN, "Shifts in selective visual attention: towards the underlying neural circuitry", HUMAN NEUROBIOLOGY, (1985), vol. 4, pages 219 - 227 |