EP2724744 - Valve assembly including a dissolvable valve member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KPR U.S., LLC 777 West Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2018/07] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Green, Kurt E 5 Hillside Drive Wrentham, MA Massachusetts 02093 / US | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Prock, Thomas Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14152055.1 | 23.06.2009 | [2014/18] | Priority number, date | US20080076850P | 30.06.2008 Original published format: US 76850 P | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2724744 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M39/22 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
A61M25/0017 (EP,US);
A61M1/77 (EP,US);
A61M1/882 (US);
A61M25/00 (US);
A61M25/0097 (EP,US);
A61M39/221 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | Ventileinheit, die ein lösliches Ventilelement enthält | [2014/18] | English: | Valve assembly including a dissolvable valve member | [2014/18] | French: | Ensemble de soupape incluant un élément de soupape dissous | [2014/18] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 23.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/51] | 07.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09163472.5 / EP2140903 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090163472) is 14.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1534219 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]US6050934 (MIKHAIL ADEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US6183437 (WALKER FRANK J [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003171768 (MCGHAN JIM J [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2006020929 (PHAGIA TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0060] - [0068] * * figures 5a,5b *; | [A]WO2006063593 (WELTLESEN RUNE WESSEL [DK], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 13, lines 5-11 * * figure 4 * |