EP2775165 - Electromechanical damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willems, Marco Daucherstrasse 27 85053 Ingolstadt / DE | [2014/37] | Application number, filing date | 14152062.7 | 22.01.2014 | [2014/37] | Priority number, date | DE20131004012 | 08.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013004012 | [2014/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2775165 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2775165 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/03, F16H1/28, H02K7/18, H02K7/116, B60G13/14, F16H1/46 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
B60G13/14 (EP,US);
B60G7/04 (KR);
F16H1/46 (US);
B60G7/00 (KR);
F16F15/03 (EP,US);
F16F15/035 (EP,US);
F16F15/10 (KR);
F16H1/28 (KR);
F16H1/32 (KR);
H02K7/116 (EP,US);
H02K7/1853 (EP,US);
B60G2202/22 (EP,US);
B60G2204/419 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4191 (EP,US);
B60G2204/421 (EP,US);
B60G2300/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | F16F15/03, F16H1/28, H02K7/18, H02K7/116, B60G13/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] |
Former [2014/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Elektromechanischer Dämpfer | [2014/37] | English: | Electromechanical damper | [2014/37] | French: | Amortisseur électromécanique | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 01.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2014 | AL | 16.05.2018 | CY | 16.05.2018 | CZ | 16.05.2018 | DK | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | ES | 16.05.2018 | FI | 16.05.2018 | HR | 16.05.2018 | IT | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | LV | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | MK | 16.05.2018 | MT | 16.05.2018 | NL | 16.05.2018 | PL | 16.05.2018 | RO | 16.05.2018 | RS | 16.05.2018 | SE | 16.05.2018 | SI | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | SM | 16.05.2018 | TR | 16.05.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | NO | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | PT | 17.09.2018 | AT | 22.01.2019 | IE | 22.01.2019 | LU | 22.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.01.2014 | |
AL | 16.05.2018 | ||
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
AT | 22.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
AT | 22.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
AT | 22.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
AT | 22.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
AT | 22.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2450290 (MAXWELL HUGH S) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2624374 (STARBARD RAYMOND EDWARD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0118012 (MUELLER ARNOLD [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3444420 (MUELLER ARNOLD) [A] 1,3-6* the whole document *; | [A]JP2000297850 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,3 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2002140302 (HSU CHUN-PU [TW]) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1935679 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102009048818 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,4-6 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] * * the whole document *; | [YD]DE102010035087 (AUDI AG [DE]) [YD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102010035088 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102011009608 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102011006094 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * | by applicant | DE10115858 | DE102010035087 |