EP2759732 - Brake shoe for a drum brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAF-HOLLAND GmbH Hauptstrasse 26 63856 Bessenbach / DE | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallmeier, Stefan Ringofenstraße 87 63773 Goldbach / DE | 02 /
Roos, Michael Düsseldorfer Straße 2 b 97828 Marktheidenfeld / DE | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14152262.3 | 23.01.2014 | [2014/31] | Priority number, date | DE201310201111 | 24.01.2013 Original published format: DE102013201111 | [2014/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2759732 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2759732 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/08, F16D51/16 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
F16D65/08 (EP,US);
F16D51/16 (EP,US);
F16D2069/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2014/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Bremsbacke für eine Trommelbremse | [2014/31] | English: | Brake shoe for a drum brake | [2014/31] | French: | Mâchoire de frein pour un frein à tambour | [2014/31] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 12.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2014 | AL | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | MT | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IE | 23.01.2017 | LU | 23.01.2017 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2019/52] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.01.2014 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.01.2014 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2723016 (GOLDBERG DAVID N) [X] 1,13,15 * column 9, line 1 - line 26; figure 16 * [I] 2-10,12,14; | [XI]US2818944 (ROBERT BARANY) [X] 1,13-15 * column 2, line 43 - line 68; figures 3,4 * [I] 8; | [XI]US1724114 (STONER GEORGE H) [X] 1-8,13-15 * page 1, line 87 - page 2, line 3; figure - * [I] 10,12; | [XI]US3412835 (MORLEY GOLDBERG CHARLES) [X] 1,13-15 * abstract * [I] 11; | [A]DE102010021393 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1,13 * abstract * |