EP2781933 - Optical sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leuze electronic GmbH + Co KG In der Braike 1 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lohmann Dr., Lutz Rosenstr. 10 82140 Olching / DE | 02 /
Luthard, Stephan Konrad-Adenauer-Str. 2 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwalt Jurastrasse 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | ||
Former [2014/39] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Jurastrasse 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | Application number, filing date | 14152579.0 | 27.01.2014 | [2014/39] | Priority number, date | DE201310102741 | 18.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013102741 | [2014/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2781933 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2781933 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/42, G02B7/28, G01S7/497, G01S7/481 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
G01S7/497 (EP);
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S7/4813 (EP);
G01S7/4816 (EP);
G01S7/4817 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2018/13] |
Former [2014/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Sensor | [2014/39] | English: | Optical sensor | [2014/39] | French: | Capteur optique | [2014/39] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 05.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE102010022159 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 1-4,6-10 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0053] *; | [Y]JPH10133087 (NEC CORP) [Y] 1-4,6-10 * figures 1-2 * * abstract *; | [A]US2009109426 (CRAMER PETER G [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] *; | [A]DE10157378 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0019] *; | [A]GB2182457 (RANK TAYLOR HOBSON LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-2 * * page 1, line 75 - line 122 * | by applicant | DE102010022159 |