EP2759745 - Movement transmission member with springs for taking up the play in an HVAC unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO THERMAL SYSTEMS S.p.A. Frazione Masio 24 10046 Poirino (Torino) / IT | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gataleta, Raffaele Frazione Masio 24 I-10046 POIRINO (Italy) / IT | 02 /
Sola, Davide Frazione Masio 24 I-10046 POIRINO (Italy) / IT | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Vanzini, Christian, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2014/31] | Application number, filing date | 14152756.4 | 28.01.2014 | [2014/31] | Priority number, date | IT2013TO00068 | 29.01.2013 Original published format: IT TO20130068 | [2014/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2759745 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/12, F16H57/00 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
F16H57/12 (EP);
B60H1/00857 (EP);
F16H57/0006 (EP);
F16H2057/127 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bewegungsübertragungselement mit Federn zur Aufnahme des Spiels einer Klimaanlage | [2014/31] | English: | Movement transmission member with springs for taking up the play in an HVAC unit | [2014/31] | French: | Élément de transmission de mouvement avec des ressorts pour enrouler le jeu dans une unité HVAC | [2014/31] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 31.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102006048533 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 6; | [A]EP2492546 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP1503108 (ASMO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016]; figure 4 * |