EP2902546 - Device for the compaction of railway ballast [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HP3 Real GmbH Börsegasse 10/5 1010 Wien / AT | [2017/06] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states System7-Railsupport GmbH Fischhof 3 1010 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lichtberger, Bernhard Silberbach 36 4230 Pregarten / AT | 02 /
Hofer, Hans Jörg Weichstetten Süd 47 4502 St. Marien / AT | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Hübscher & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | [2020/36] |
Former [2015/32] | Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 14153245.7 | 30.01.2014 | [2015/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2902546 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2902546 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/43] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2902546 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E01B27/20, B06B1/18 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
E01B27/20 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B06B1/183 (EP,US);
E01B2203/127 (CN);
E01B2203/141 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2015/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verdichten der Schotterbettung eines Gleises | [2015/32] | English: | Device for the compaction of railway ballast | [2015/32] | French: | Dispositif de compression du lit de ballast d'une voie ferrée | [2015/32] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 05.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.07.2018
26.07.2018
ADMISSIBLE Plasser & Theurer, Export von Bahnbaumaschinen, Gesellschaft m.b.H. Johannesgasse 3 1010 Wien / AT | [2018/35] | 06.08.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.12.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.12.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.01.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.01.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.07.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2014 | AL | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | IT | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | MT | 25.10.2017 | NL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IE | 30.01.2018 | LU | 30.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | FR | 31.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2021/18] |
Former [2020/34] | HU | 30.01.2014 | |
AL | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.01.2014 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 30.01.2014 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5887527 (THEURER JOSEF [AT], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 3 - column 4; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]CH641064 (KOEHRING GMBH BOMAG DIVISION [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1653003 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ [AT]) [Y] 4 * column 1 - column 2; figure 2 * | Opposition | SU1761845 | DE4102869 | EP0688902 | AT336663B |