EP2902103 - A PROCESS TO PREPARE JANUS PARTICLES WITH POLYMER SHELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/32] | Janus particles with polymer shells | ||
[2019/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leibniz-Institut für Polymerforschung Dresden e.V. Hohe Strasse 6 01069 Dresden / DE | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Synytska, Alla Klingenberger Straße 20 01187 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Kirillova, Alina Hochschulstraße 44 01069 Dresden / DE | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2019/27] |
Former [2015/32] | Andrae | Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Uhlandstraße 2 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14153410.7 | 31.01.2014 | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2902103 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2902103 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/16 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
B01J13/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2015/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON JANUSTEILCHEN MIT POLYMERSCHALEN | [2019/27] | English: | A PROCESS TO PREPARE JANUS PARTICLES WITH POLYMER SHELLS | [2019/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PREPARATION DE PARTICULES DE JANUS DOTÉES DE COQUES EN POLYMÈRE | [2019/09] |
Former [2015/32] | Janusteilchen mit Polymerschalen | ||
Former [2015/32] | Janus particles with polymer shells | ||
Former [2015/32] | Particules de Janus dotées de coques en polymère | Examination procedure | 04.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2014 | AL | 03.07.2019 | CY | 03.07.2019 | DK | 03.07.2019 | EE | 03.07.2019 | FI | 03.07.2019 | HR | 03.07.2019 | LT | 03.07.2019 | LV | 03.07.2019 | MC | 03.07.2019 | MK | 03.07.2019 | MT | 03.07.2019 | RO | 03.07.2019 | RS | 03.07.2019 | SI | 03.07.2019 | SK | 03.07.2019 | SM | 03.07.2019 | TR | 03.07.2019 | BG | 03.10.2019 | NO | 03.10.2019 | GR | 04.10.2019 | IS | 03.11.2019 | BE | 31.01.2020 | IE | 31.01.2020 | LU | 31.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.01.2014 | |
AL | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
MT | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
IE | 31.01.2020 | ||
LU | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
IE | 31.01.2020 | ||
LU | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
LU | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
LU | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 03.07.2019 | |
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 03.07.2019 | |
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 03.07.2019 | |
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 03.07.2019 | |
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 03.07.2019 | |
NO | 03.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN102211753 (CHINESE ACAD INST CHEMISTRY) [X] 12 * Example 7 *; | [X]CN102653580 (UNIV HEBEI TECHNOLOGY) [X] 12 * Figure 5 *; | [XA]US2012296029 (LIU GUOJUN [CA], et al) [X] 12 * Figure 1; Paragraph [0162] * [A] 1-11; | [XAI]WO2013050773 (UNIV WARWICK [GB]) [X] 9,11 * Example 1; Figure 4. * [A] 1-8 [I] 10; | [XAI] - JIAN ZHANG ET AL, "Surface-Initiated Free Radical Polymerization at the Liquid-Liquid Interface: A One-Step Approach for the Synthesis of Amphiphilic Janus Silica Particles", LANGMUIR, (20090602), vol. 25, no. 11, doi:10.1021/la9000279, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 6431 - 6437, XP055126380 [X] 9 * Page 6432-6433; Scheme 1. * [A] 11 [I] 1-8,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la9000279 | [A] - JIAN ZHANG ET AL, "Bioconjugated Janus Particles Prepared by in Situ Click Chemistry", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, (20090908), vol. 21, no. 17, doi:10.1021/cm901437n, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 4012 - 4018, XP055126374 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm901437n | [A] - DICKSON M. ANDALA ET AL, "Templated Synthesis of Amphiphilic Nanoparticles at the Liquid-Liquid Interface", ACS NANO, (20120228), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:10.1021/nn202556b, ISSN 1936-0851, pages 1044 - 1050, XP055126233 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn202556b | [XDA] - BERGER S ET AL, "Stimuli-Responsive biocomponent polymer janus particles by Grafting from/Grafting to approaches", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 41, doi:10.1021/MA802089H, ISSN 0024-9297, (20081223), pages 9669 - 9676, (20081121), XP002615985 [XD] 12 * Figure 2; Pages 9670, 9672. * [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma802089h | [X] - WANG B ET AL, "Janus gold nanoparticle with bicompartment polymer brushes templated by polymer single crystals", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, vol. 51, no. 21, ISSN 0032-3861, (20100814), pages 4814 - 4822, (20100814), XP027321052 [X] 12 * Scheme 1 * | [X] - WANG WEIWEI ET AL, "Facile access to cytocompatible multicompartment micelles with adjustable Janus-cores from A-block-B-graft-C terpolymers prepared by combination of ROP and ATRP", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES. B, BIOINTERFACES, (20131221), vol. 115, doi:10.1016/J.COLSURFB.2013.12.026, ISSN 0927-7765, pages 302 - 309, XP028836547 [X] 12 * Schemes 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.colsurfb.2013.12.026 | [X] - JIANZHONG DU ET AL, "Anisotropic particles with patchy, multicompartment and Janus architectures: preparation and application", CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS, (20110308), vol. 40, no. 5, doi:10.1039/c0cs00216j, ISSN 0306-0012, page 2402, XP055084593 [X] 12 * Figure 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0cs00216j | by applicant | - S. BERGER; A. SYNYTSKA; L. LONOV; K. J. EICHHORN; M. STAMM, MACROMOLECULES, (2008), vol. 41, pages 9669 - 9676 | - J. HU; S. ZHOU; Y. SUN; X. FANG; L. WU, CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS, (2012), vol. 41, pages 4356 - 4378 | - F. LIANG; K. SHEN; X. QU; C. ZHANG; Q. WANG; J. LI; J. LIU; Z. YANG, ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (2011), vol. 50, pages 2379 - 2382 | - S. WEISS; D. HIRSEMANN; B. BIERSACK; M. ZIADEH; A. H. E. MULLER; J. BREU, POLYMER, (2013), vol. 54, pages 1388 - 1396 | - LYER, K. S. ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (2003), vol. 36, pages 6519 - 6526 | - LONOV, L. ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2005), vol. 21, pages 8711 - 8716 | - BERGER, S. ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (2008), vol. 41, pages 9669 - 9676 | - MACROMOLECULES, (2008), vol. 41, pages 9669 - 9676 |