EP2728142 - Turbocharger bearing health monitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosny, Diaa 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | 02 /
Ahmad, Samir 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2014/19] | Application number, filing date | 14153500.5 | 07.05.2010 | [2014/19] | Priority number, date | US20090467516 | 18.05.2009 Original published format: US 467516 | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2728142 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2728142 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02C6/12, G01M13/04 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
F02C6/12 (EP,US);
G01M13/045 (EP,US);
F05D2240/50 (EP,US);
F05D2260/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Title | German: | Turbolader mit Lagerzustandsüberwachung | [2014/19] | English: | Turbocharger bearing health monitor | [2014/19] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de surveillance de l'état des paliers pour turbocompresseurs | [2014/19] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 08.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10162365.0 / EP2253819 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100162365) is 06.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2010 | AL | 29.06.2016 | AT | 29.06.2016 | BE | 29.06.2016 | CY | 29.06.2016 | CZ | 29.06.2016 | DK | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | ES | 29.06.2016 | FI | 29.06.2016 | HR | 29.06.2016 | IT | 29.06.2016 | LT | 29.06.2016 | LV | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | MK | 29.06.2016 | NL | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | SE | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | SM | 29.06.2016 | TR | 29.06.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | NO | 29.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 07.05.2010 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.05.2010 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.05.2010 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 29.06.2016 | |
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 29.06.2016 | |
NO | 29.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2173865 (COAL IND) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]US2007079613 (GREENTREE CHRISTOPHER [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1867850 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2007079613 | EP1867850 |