EP2765248 - Rim block holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bolton Manitoba SpA Via G.B. Pirelli 19 20124 Milano / IT | [2014/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bianchi, Raoul Via Val Formazza, 3 20811 CESANO MADERNO (MB) / IT | 02 /
Iraci, Valentino Largo Leopardi, 1 22100 COMO / IT | 03 /
Baiguerra, Gianpaolo Via Matteotti, 45H 20020 ARESE (MI) / IT | [2014/33] | Representative(s) | Branca, Emanuela, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Ottazzo, Marco Francesco Agostino, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 14154488.2 | 10.02.2014 | [2014/33] | Priority number, date | IT2013MI00195 | 12.02.2013 Original published format: IT MI20130195 | [2014/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2765248 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/03 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
E03D9/032 (EP);
E03D2009/024 (EP);
E03D2009/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WC-Körbchen für Reinigungsblock | [2014/33] | English: | Rim block holder | [2014/33] | French: | Dispositif de rafraichissement d'une cuvette de W.C. | [2014/33] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 23.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]FR2579647 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-7,13 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 8-12 [I] 14; | [Y]DE2920635 (GLOBOL WERK) [Y] 8-12 * figures 5-7 *; | [Y]EP0092283 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [Y] 8-12 * figure 4 *; | [A]DE1871187U (WAGNER GES MIT BESCHRAENKTER H [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2007107750 | EP1891197 | WO2011141720 | US2214798 |