EP2786997 - Peripheral opioid receptor antagonists and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bazhina, Nataliya 7 Carol Lane Tappan, NY 10983 / US | 02 /
Donato, George, Joseph 517 Michigan Avenue Swarthmore, PA 19081 / US | 03 /
Fabian, Steven, R. 15 Periwinkle Drive Barnegat, NJ 08005 / US | 04 /
Lokhnauth, John 14-11 Prospect Avenue Fair Lawn, NJ 07410 / US | 05 /
Megati, Sreenivasulu 1 Hearth Court New City, NY 10956 / US | 06 /
Melucci, Charles 37 Liberty Drive Highland Mills, NY 10930 / US | 07 /
Ofslager, Christian 4 Rockwood Drive Newburgh, NY 12550 / US | 08 /
Patel, Niketa 47 Windsor Drive Lincoln Park, NJ 07035 / US | 09 /
Radebaugh, Galen 41 South Road Chester, NJ 07930 / US | 10 /
Shah, Syed, M. 1 Ora Court East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | 11 /
Szeliga, Jan 41 Irving Avenue Croton on Hudson, NY 10520 / US | 12 /
Zhang, Huyi 8 Donaldson Lane Garnerville, NY 10923 / US | 13 /
Zhu, Tianmin 5 Whitman Place Monroe, NY 10950 / US | [2015/01] |
Former [2014/41] | 01 /
Bazhina, Nataliya 7 Carol Lane Tappan, NY 10983 / US | ||
02 /
Donato, George, Joseph 517 Michigan Avenue Swarthmore, PA 19081 / US | |||
03 /
Fabian, Steven, R. 15 Periwinkle Drive Barnegat, NJ 08005 / US | |||
04 /
Lohnauth, John 14-11 Prospect Avenue Fair Lawn, NJ 07410 / US | |||
05 /
Megati, Sreenivasulu 1 Hearth Court New City, NY 10956 / US | |||
06 /
Melucci, Charles 37 Liberty Drive Highland Mills, NY 10930 / US | |||
07 /
Ofslager, Christian 4 Rockwood Drive Newburgh, NY 12550 / US | |||
08 /
Patel, Niketa 47 Windsor Drive Lincoln Park, NJ 07035 / US | |||
09 /
Radebaugh, Galen 41 South Road Chester, NJ 07930 / US | |||
10 /
Shah, Syed, M. 1 Ora Court East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | |||
11 /
Szeliga, Jan 41 Irving Avenue Croton on Hudson, NY 10520 / US | |||
12 /
Zhang, Huyi 8 Donaldson Lane Garnerville, NY 10923 / US | |||
13 /
Zhu, Tianmin 5 Whitman Place Monroe, NY 10950 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14154611.9 | 30.09.2009 | [2014/41] | Priority number, date | US20080101201P | 30.09.2008 Original published format: US 101201 P | US20090226581P | 17.07.2009 Original published format: US 226581 P | US20090237428P | 27.08.2009 Original published format: US 237428 P | [2014/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2786997 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D489/08, A61K31/485 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/485 (EP,KR,US);
C07D489/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07D221/28 (CN);
A61D7/00 (CN);
A61J1/05 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/08 (US);
A61K9/20 (US);
A61M5/178 (CN,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D471/08 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2014/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 08.04.2015 | BA | 08.04.2015 | RS | 08.04.2015 | Title | German: | PERIPHERE OPIOIDREZEPTORANTAGONISTEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2014/41] | English: | Peripheral opioid receptor antagonists and uses thereof | [2014/41] | French: | Antagonistes de récepteur opioïde périphérique et leurs utilisations | [2014/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 23.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.05.2017 | 04.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/44] | 21.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09740568.2 / EP2356119 | Divisional application(s) | EP19197036.7 / EP3608322 | EP22168111.7 / EP4071151 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006127898 (PROGENICS PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 63, line 1 - line 8; claim 1 * [I] 1-13; | [XDI]WO2006127899 (PROGENICS PHARM INC [US], et al) [XD] 1-8 * page 15, line 11 - line 16 *[I] 1-13; | [XDI]WO2008019115 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [XD] 1-8 * Paragraphs [018], [027], [028], [038] * [I] 1-13 |