EP2797051 - Image processing device, image processing method, program, and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/44] | Image saliency map determination device, method, program, and recording medium | ||
[2021/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruan, Xiang c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
Huchuan, Lu c/o Dalian University of Technology School of Electronic and Information Engineering No. 2 Linggong Road, Ganjingzi District Dalian City, Liaoning Province 116023 / CN | 03 /
Chuan, Yang c/o Dalian University of Technology School of Electronic and Information Engineering No. 2 Linggong Road, Ganjingzi District Dalian City, Liaoning Province 116023 / CN | 04 /
Lihe, Zhang c/o Dalian University of Technology School of Electronic and Information Engineering No. 2 Linggong Road, Ganjingzi District Dalian City, Liaoning Province 116023 / CN | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14154825.5 | 12.02.2014 | [2014/44] | Priority number, date | JP20130094757 | 26.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013094757 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2797051 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2797051 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2797051 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/11, G06T7/194, G06K9/32, G06K9/38, G06K9/46 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/194 (EP,US);
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
G06V10/28 (EP,US);
G06V10/462 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/47] | G06K9/32, G06K9/38, G06T7/00, G06K9/46 | ||
Former IPC [2014/44] | G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2014/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsgerät, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren, Programm und Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2021/08] | English: | Image processing device, image processing method, program, and recording medium | [2021/08] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'images, méthode de traitement d'images, programme et support d'enrigstrement | [2021/08] |
Former [2014/44] | Vorrichtung, Verfahren, Programm und Aufzeichnungsmedium zur Erstellung der Salienzkarte eines Bildes | ||
Former [2014/44] | Image saliency map determination device, method, program, and recording medium | ||
Former [2014/44] | Dispositif, procédé, programme et support d'enregistrement pour la création d'une carte de saillance d'une image | Examination procedure | 18.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 02.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2014 | AL | 07.04.2021 | AT | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | CZ | 07.04.2021 | DK | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | ES | 07.04.2021 | FI | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | IT | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | NL | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SE | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | TR | 07.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 12.02.2014 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 12.02.2014 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 12.02.2014 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID] - YICHEN WEI ET AL, Geodesic Saliency Using Background Priors, COMPUTER VISION ECCV 2012, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 29 - 42, (20121007), ISBN 978-3-642-33711-6, XP047018985 [ID] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-33712-3_3 | [XP] - YANG CHUAN ET AL, "Saliency Detection via Graph-Based Manifold Ranking", IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION. PROCEEDINGS, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, US, doi:10.1109/CVPR.2013.407, ISSN 1063-6919, (20130623), pages 3166 - 3173, (20131002), XP032493125 [XP] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2013.407 | [IP] - JIANG BOWEN ET AL, "Saliency Detection via Absorbing Markov Chain", 2013 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, IEEE, doi:10.1109/ICCV.2013.209, ISSN 1550-5499, (20131204), pages 1665 - 1672, (20140228), XP032572741 [IP] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2013.209 | [A] - VICTOR LEMPITSKY ET AL, "Image segmentation with a bounding box prior", COMPUTER VISION, 2009 IEEE 12TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090929), ISBN 978-1-4244-4420-5, pages 277 - 284, XP031672592 [A] 3 * page 278, column r, paragraph l - page 279, column r, paragraph 6; figure 2 * | by applicant | JP2001236508 | JP2010258914 | - D. ZHOU; J. WESTON; A. GRETTON; O. BOUSQUET; B. SCHOLKOPF, "Ranking on data manifolds", ADVANCES IN NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEMS, (2004), vol. 16, pages 169 - 176 | - J. HE; M. LI; H.J. ZHANG; H. TONG; C. ZHANG, "Manifold-ranking based image retrieval", PROC. OF ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE MULTIMEDIA, (2004), doi:doi:10.1145/1027527.1027531, pages 9 - 16, XP058319686 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1027527.1027531 | - H. JIANG; J. WANG; Z. YUAN; T LIU; N. ZHENG; S. LI, "Automatic salient object segmentation based on context and shape prior", BRITISH MACHINE VISION CONFERENCE, (2011), doi:doi:10.5244/C.25.110, pages 1 - 12, XP055169317 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5244/C.25.110 | - Y. C. WEI; F. WEN; W. J. ZHU; J. SUN., GEODESIC SALIENCY USING BACKGROUND PRIORS | - MING-MING CHENG; GUO-XIN ZHANG; NILOY J. MITRA; XIAOLEI HUANG; SHI-MIN HU, "Global contrast based saliency region detection", IEEE CVPR, (2011), pages 409 - 416 | - S. GOFERMAN; L. ZELNIK-MANOR; A. TAL, "Context-aware saliency detection", IEEE CVPR, (2010), pages 2376 - 2383, XP031725758 | - R. ACHANTA; S. HEMAMI; F. ESTRADA; S. SUSSTRUNK, "Frequency-tunedsaliency region detection", IEEE CVPR, (2009), pages 1597 - 1604 | - L. ITTI; C. KOCH; E. NIEBUR, "A model of saliency-based visual attention for rapid scene analysis", IEEE TPAMI, (1998), vol. 20, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1109/34.730558, pages 1254 - 1259, XP001203933 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.730558 | - Y. ZHAI; M. SHAH, "Visual attention detection in video sequences using spatiotemporal cues", ACM MULTIMEDIA, (2006), doi:doi:10.1145/1180639.1180824, pages 815 - 824, XP058233393 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1180639.1180824 | - R. ACHANTA; F. ESTRADA; P. WILS; S. S, "usstrunk, ''Salient region detection and segmentation", IEEE ICVS, (2008), pages 66 - 75 | - J. HAREL; C. KOCH; P. PERONA, "Graph-based visual saliency", NIPS, (2007), pages 545 - 552 | - X. HOU; L. ZHANG, "Saliency detection: A spectral residual approach", IEEE CVPR, (2007), pages 1 - 8, XP031114524 |