EP2908336 - A package of power dies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | For:FR
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mollov, Stefan Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | 02 /
Ewanchuk, Jeffrey Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | 03 /
Lefevre, Guillaume Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708 RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 3, impasse de la Vigie CS 71840 35418 Saint-Malo Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14155455.0 | 17.02.2014 | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2908336 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/373, H01L23/16, H01L23/473, H01L25/07 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
H01L23/16 (EP,US);
H01L23/49568 (US);
H01L21/4846 (US);
H01L23/345 (US);
H01L23/36 (US);
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
H01L23/49575 (US);
H01L23/5385 (US);
H01L24/72 (EP,US);
H01L25/072 (EP,US);
H01L25/115 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2015/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verpackung von Leistungsmatrizen | [2015/34] | English: | A package of power dies | [2015/34] | French: | Boîtier de puces de puissance | [2015/34] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 27.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/08] | 04.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007267739 (KAJIWARA RYOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * figure - * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0033] *; | [Y]DE102007005233 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * figure - * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0064] *; | [Y]US2011024896 (TSUNODA TETSUJIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * figures 14-17 * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0066] *; | [Y]EP2346153 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * figure - * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0073] *; | [Y]EP2590213 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * figure - * * paragraph [0031] ** paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052] * |