19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
22.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
28.07.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
21.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
19.08.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
17.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.08.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] |
05.04.2015 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] |
27.03.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.10.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] |
29.08.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] |