EP2735509 - Monument for an aircraft cabin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2014/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tappe, Jürgen Uhlandstraße 6 22087 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Holst, Christian Halbmondsweg 7 22605 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Sturm, Ralph Mühlenstraße 16 22869 Schenefeld / DE | 04 /
Behlau, Gregor c/o Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
Waller, Michael Flurstraße 6 22549 Hamburg / DE | 06 /
Trautmann, Frank Hasenweg 11 27419 Vierden / DE | 07 /
Terstal, Arne Himmelmoorchaussee 27 25451 Quickborn / DE | 08 /
Rose, Hasko Parkstrasse 31 22605 Hamburg / DE | 09 /
Granzeier, Werner Grosse Seite 7 21635 Jork / DE | 10 /
Richenberger, Michael Saxtorfer Weg 133 24340 Eckernförde / DE | [2016/17] |
Former [2014/42] | 01 /
Tappe, Jürgen Uhlandstraße 6 22087 Hamburg / DE | ||
02 /
Holst, Christian Halbmondsweg 7 22605 Hamburg / DE | |||
03 /
Sturm, Ralph Mühlenstraße 16 22869 Schenefeld / DE | |||
04 /
Behlau, Gregor c/o Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | |||
05 /
Waller, Michael Flurstraße 6 22549 Hamburg / DE | |||
06 /
Trautmann, Frank Hasenweg 11 27419 Vierden / DE | |||
07 /
Terstal, Arne Himmelmoorchaussee 27 25451 Quickborn / DE | |||
08 /
* * * | |||
09 /
* * * | |||
10 /
* * * | |||
Former [2014/41] | 01 /
Tappe, Jürgen Uhlandstraße 6 22087 Hamburg / DE | ||
02 /
Holst, Christian Halbmondsweg 7 22605 Hamburg / DE | |||
03 /
Sturm, Ralph Mühlenstraße 16 22869 Schenefeld / DE | |||
04 /
Behlau, Gregor c/o Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | |||
05 /
Waller, Michael Flurstraße 6 22549 Hamburg / DE | |||
06 /
Trautmann, Frank Hasenweg 11 27419 Vierden / DE | |||
07 /
Terstal, Arne Himmelmoorchaussee 27 25451 Quickborn / DE | |||
Former [2014/22] | 01 /
Tappe, Jürgen Uhlandstraße 6 22087 Hamburg / DE | ||
02 /
Holst, Christian Halbmondsweg 7 22605 Hamburg / DE | |||
03 /
Sturm, Ralph Mühlenstraße 16 22869 Schenefeld / DE | |||
04 /
Behlau, Gregor Am Felde 33 22765 Hamburg / DE | |||
05 /
Waller, Michael Flurstraße 6 22549 Hamburg / DE | |||
06 /
Trautmann, Frank Hasenweg 11 27419 Vierden / DE | |||
07 /
Terstal, Arne Barlachstraße 13 21073 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | Kopf Westenberger Wachenhausen Patentanwälte PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/22] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14155620.9 | 22.07.2010 | [2014/22] | Priority number, date | DE20091034406 | 23.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009034406 | US20090228037P | 23.07.2009 Original published format: US 228037 P | [2014/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2735509 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2735509 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/02, B64D11/00 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
B64D11/02 (EP,US);
B64D2011/0046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/22] | Title | German: | Monument für eine Kabine eines Fahrzeugs | [2014/22] | English: | Monument for an aircraft cabin | [2014/22] | French: | Monument pour cabine d'aéronef | [2014/22] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/22] | 25.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10735287.4 / EP2456667 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2010 | AL | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | ES | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | HR | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | IT | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | MK | 27.04.2016 | MT | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | SM | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | AT | 22.07.2016 | IE | 22.07.2016 | LU | 22.07.2016 | NO | 27.07.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 22.07.2010 | |
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
MT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 22.07.2016 | ||
IE | 22.07.2016 | ||
LU | 22.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 22.07.2010 | |
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
MT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 22.07.2016 | ||
IE | 22.07.2016 | ||
LU | 22.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 22.07.2010 | |
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
MT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 22.07.2016 | ||
IE | 22.07.2016 | ||
LU | 22.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.07.2010 | |
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 22.07.2016 | ||
IE | 22.07.2016 | ||
LU | 22.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 22.07.2016 | ||
IE | 22.07.2016 | ||
LU | 22.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 22.07.2016 | ||
LU | 22.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 27.04.2016 | |
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 27.04.2016 | |
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 27.04.2016 | |
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 27.04.2016 | |
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0850833 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 5-10 * * column 2, lines 18-24 * * column 3, line 32 - column 7, line 4 * * column 8, lines 8-23 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP1209078 (JAMCO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0013] - [0015] - [0038] * * figures 1-11 *; | [A]EP1338508 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0019] - [0031] * * figures 1-9B *; | [A]EP0867365 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 5-11 * * column 2, lines 3-30 * * column 3, line 39 - column 10, line 6 * * figures 1-22 * | by applicant | EP0850833 | US4589463 | US6889936 |