Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2770032 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2770032



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 149
05.04.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
27.02.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
24.07.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.06.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 17
19.06.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 3
19.06.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
19.06.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
24.05.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
02.05.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
22.04.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
14.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.02.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
19.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
19.02.2014 Description Search / examination 52
19.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2014 Drawings Search / examination 1
19.02.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5