blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2770032

EP2770032 - Film adhesive, dicing tape with film adhesive, method of manufacturing semiconductor device, and semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.07.2018  [2018/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-1-2, Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP
[2014/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Sugo, Yuki
c/o Nitto Denko Corporation
1-1-2, Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP
02 / Kimura, Yuta
c/o Nitto Denko Corporation
1-1-2, Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP
 [2014/35]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date14155678.719.02.2014
[2014/35]
Priority number, dateJP2013003133620.02.2013         Original published format: JP 2013031336
JP2014000151408.01.2014         Original published format: JP 2014001514
[2014/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2770032
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2770032
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2017
ClassificationIPC:C09J7/02, C08K3/00, C09J9/02, C09J11/04, C08G59/62, C08K3/08, C09J163/00, H01L23/48, H01L21/50, H01L23/00, H01L21/683
[2017/28]
CPC:
H01L21/6836 (EP,US); C09J9/02 (EP,KR,US); C08G59/621 (EP,US);
C08K3/02 (EP,US); C08L33/06 (EP,US); C09J11/04 (EP,US);
C09J163/00 (EP,US); C09J7/00 (KR); C09J7/20 (EP,US);
H01L21/48 (KR); H01L21/50 (US); H01L23/48 (US);
H01L24/27 (EP,US); H01L24/29 (EP,US); H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H01L24/85 (EP,US); H01L24/92 (EP,US); C08K3/08 (EP,US);
C09J2203/326 (EP,US); C09J2301/208 (EP,US); C09J2301/312 (EP,US);
C09J2301/408 (EP,US); H01L2221/68327 (EP,US); H01L2221/68377 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68381 (EP,US); H01L2221/68386 (EP,US); H01L2224/27003 (EP,US);
H01L2224/271 (EP,US); H01L2224/27436 (EP,US); H01L2224/2929 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29339 (EP,US); H01L2224/29344 (EP,US); H01L2224/29347 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29355 (EP,US); H01L2224/29388 (EP,US); H01L2224/29393 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29424 (EP,US); H01L2224/29444 (EP,US); H01L2224/29447 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29455 (EP,US); H01L2224/29499 (EP,US); H01L2224/32145 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US); H01L2224/32245 (EP,US); H01L2224/45124 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US); H01L2224/45147 (EP,US); H01L2224/48145 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48225 (EP,US); H01L2224/48227 (EP,US); H01L2224/48245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US); H01L2224/73265 (EP,US); H01L2224/83191 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83203 (EP,US); H01L2224/83851 (EP,US); H01L2224/83885 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83907 (EP,US); H01L2224/85207 (EP,US); H01L2224/92 (EP,US);
H01L2224/94 (EP,US); H01L24/32 (EP,US); H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US); H01L24/94 (EP,US); H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US); H01L2924/3511 (EP,US); Y10T428/1405 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C09J163/00, C08K3/02, C08L33/06 (EP,US);
H01L2224/271, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/27436, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2929, H01L2924/0635 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2929, H01L2924/0665 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29339, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29344, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29347, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29355, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29388, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29393, H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29424, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29444, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29447, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29455, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45147, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48145, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32145, H01L2224/48145, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32145, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32145, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/92, H01L2224/27, H01L21/78, H01L2221/68386, H01L2224/83 (EP,US);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/27 (US,EP);
H01L2924/01322, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00 (US);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US)
(-)
Former IPC [2014/35]C09J7/02, C08K3/00, C09J9/02, C09J11/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Folienkleber, Sägefolienband mit Folienkleber, Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Halbleitervorrichtung und Halbleitervorrichtung[2014/35]
English:Film adhesive, dicing tape with film adhesive, method of manufacturing semiconductor device, and semiconductor device[2014/35]
French:Film adhésif, ruban de découpage avec film adhésif, procédé de fabrication de dispositif semi-conducteur et dispositif semi-conducteur[2014/35]
Examination procedure19.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/35]
20.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/29]
27.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201805   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2005276925  ;
 JPH06145639  [ ] (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD);
 [XD]US5605763  (YUSA MASAMI [JP], et al) [XD] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * * column 9, paragraph 2 *;
 [XI]WO2009067113  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0051] * [I] 1-11;
 [A]US2011052853  (SUGO YUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *;
 [XI]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 75, Database accession no. 2005-728830, XP002770551 & JP2005276925 A 20051006 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-11 * abstract * [I] 1-11
by applicantJPS60196956
 JPH06145639
 JP4137827B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.