19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
23.09.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] |
16.09.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
27.05.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
19.06.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
15.06.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.06.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.06.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
31.03.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.11.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
14.11.2014 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
26.08.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] |
25.07.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] |