EP2781563 - Ink for ink jet recording, recording apparatus, and recorded medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okuyama, Tomoyuki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Hiroko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2014/39] | Application number, filing date | 14155906.2 | 20.02.2014 | [2014/39] | Priority number, date | JP20130060995 | 22.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013060995 | [2014/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2781563 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2781563 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
C09D11/38 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2014/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Tinte für Tintenstrahlaufzeichnung, Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung, und Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2014/39] | English: | Ink for ink jet recording, recording apparatus, and recorded medium | [2014/39] | French: | Encre pour enregistrement à jet d'encre, appareil d'enregistrement et support enregistré | [2014/39] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 06.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2007238798 (KONICA MINOLTA IJ TECHNOLOGIES) [X] 1-8 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP1142968 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US5772743 (GUNDLACH KURT B [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP1426194 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * example -; claim - *; | [X]JP2012177079 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-8 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO0034427 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-8 * example -; claim - * |