EP2784629 - Method for controlling portable device equipped with flexible display, and portable device using the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Hyungjin Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Kyungjung Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Sungchul Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Hong, Hyunju Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Birchenough, Lewis HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14156083.9 | 21.02.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | KR20130031545 | 25.03.2013 Original published format: KR 20130031545 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2784629 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2784629 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F1/16, G06F3/041, G06F3/0487, G06F3/0483, // G09G3/00 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
G06F1/1652 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/01 (KR);
G06F1/1626 (KR);
G06F1/1694 (KR);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (KR);
G06F3/0483 (EP,US);
G06F3/0487 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2014/40] | G06F3/01, G06F1/16, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer mit einer flexiblen Anzeige ausgestatteten, tragbaren Vorrichtung und tragbare Vorrichtung mit dem Verfahren | [2014/40] | English: | Method for controlling portable device equipped with flexible display, and portable device using the method | [2014/40] | French: | Procédé de commande de dispositif portable équipé d'un affichage flexible et dispositif portable utilisant ce procédé | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 22.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2202624 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0089] * * figures 12,13 *; | [X]US2010141605 (KANG TAE YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0060] *; | [X]US2007085845 (KIKUCHI FUMIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0057] *; | [A]US2004008191 (POUPYREV IVAN [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0065] , [0 66] , [0 67] * * paragraphs [0126] , [ 127] * * paragraph [0299] - paragraph [0306] * |