EP2911264 - Charging circuit for a battery with elevated output voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brusa Elektronik AG Neudorf 14 9466 Sennwald / CH | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krause, Axel Bühl 9650 Nesslau / CH | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | PPR AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | Application number, filing date | 14156254.6 | 21.02.2014 | [2015/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2911264 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02J5/00, B60L11/18, G05F3/02, H02J7/02, H02J17/00 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
B60L53/122 (EP,US);
B60L53/12 (US);
B60L53/126 (EP,US);
B60L53/22 (EP);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
H02J50/70 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ladeschaltung für einen Akkumulator mit erhöhter Ausgangsspannung | [2015/35] | English: | Charging circuit for a battery with elevated output voltage | [2015/35] | French: | Circuit de charge pour un accumulateur doté d'une tension de sortie accrue | [2015/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/37] | 11.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB843843 (PYE LTD) [X] 1 * column 1, line 13 - line 42; figure 1 * [Y] 7; | [XY]US3046466 (TYRRELL PAUL C, et al) [X] 1,4 * column 5, line 65 - column 7, line 30; figure 5 * [Y] 2,3,7; | [X]EP0633652 (SDS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [SG]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 12 - line 22 *; | [A]US2009152954 (LE TRIET TU [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0060] - paragraphs [0062] , [0067]; figure 8 *; | [Y]US2011199028 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al) [Y] 9-15 * paragraph [0275] - paragraph [0288] *; | [XY]US2012007435 (SADA TOMOKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0124]; figures 9a,b * [Y] 9-15; | [Y]US2013069440 (MARUKAME TAKAO [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0069]; figure 3 *; | [XAY]WO2013136409 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,8 * abstract * [A] 5,6 [Y] 2,3,7,9-15 |