EP2735470 - Vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls GmbH Industriestrasse 20-30 51399 Burscheid / DE | [2014/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooke, David 82 Cotton Lane, Halton Lodge Runcorn Cheshire WA7 5NE / GB | 02 /
Mathews, Ian Neusserstr. 112A 50670 Köln / DE | 03 /
Van-Soolingen, Marc Metternichstraat 1 5932 AW Tegelen / NL | 04 /
Ndagijimana, Robin Hochstadenstraße 27 41469 Neuss / DE | 05 /
Pellenz, Wolfgang Am Düsterbäumchen 4 53340 Meckenheim / DE | [2014/49] |
Former [2014/22] | 01 /
Cooke, David Nagelsbaum 8 51399 Burscheid / DE | ||
02 /
Mathews, Ian Neusserstr. 112A 50670 Köln / DE | |||
03 /
Van-Soolingen, Marc Metternichstraat 1 5932 AW Tegelen / NL | |||
04 /
Ndagijimana, Robin Hochstadenstraße 27 41469 Neuss / DE | |||
05 /
Pellenz, Wolfgang Am Düsterbäumchen 4 53340 Meckenheim / DE | Representative(s) | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/22] | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 14156357.7 | 30.10.2007 | [2014/22] | Priority number, date | DE20061053201 | 09.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006053201 | DE20071028052 | 14.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007028052 | [2014/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2735470 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2735470 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/66, B60N2/70, B60N2/64, B60N2/44 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
B60N2/7011 (EP,US);
B60N2/643 (US);
B60N2/66 (US);
B60N2/667 (EP,US);
B60N2/6671 (EP,US);
B60N2/6673 (EP,US);
B60N2/986 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/22] | B60N2/22, B60N2/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2014/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsitz | [2014/22] | English: | Vehicle seat | [2014/22] | French: | Siège de véhicule | [2014/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 19.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07819485.9 / EP2089248 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070819485) is 24.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2007 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | ES | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | IS | 24.08.2016 | IT | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MT | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | SE | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | AT | 30.10.2016 | IE | 30.10.2016 | LU | 30.10.2016 | BE | 31.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | GB | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | [2018/45] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 30.10.2007 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 30.10.2016 | ||
IE | 30.10.2016 | ||
LU | 30.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.10.2007 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 30.10.2016 | ||
IE | 30.10.2016 | ||
LU | 30.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 30.10.2016 | ||
IE | 30.10.2016 | ||
LU | 30.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 30.10.2016 | ||
LU | 30.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
LU | 30.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | ES | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE10144078 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, paragraph 19 - paragraph 20; figure 2 * [Y] 2-10; | [XY]DE3707926 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 2-10 * column 2, line 47 - line 59; figures 1-5 * [Y] 2-10; | [XYI]EP1167116 (CERA [FR]) [X] 2 * paragraphs [0027] , [0036]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,5,7 [I] 5,7 | Examination | EP0328137 | WO2007112564 | by applicant | DE4303006 | DE69724103T | WO2006EP01191 |