Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
26.10.2022 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
26.05.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
20.02.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.05.2021 | Change - applicant | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
20.04.2021 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
05.03.2021 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.02.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.10.2020 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
30.10.2020 | First examination report | |
24.02.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.03.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.05.2018 | Change - applicant | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
27.04.2018 | Change - applicant | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
01.03.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.03.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.02.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.01.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
22.01.2016 | Change - designated states | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
25.08.2015 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |