EP2910413 - Seat assembly with temperature or humidity sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 Postfach 235 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2021/26] |
Former [2018/25] | For all designated states Sensirion Automotive Solutions AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | ||
Former [2018/22] | For all designated states Sensiron Automotive Solutions AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa ZH / CH | ||
Former [2015/35] | For all designated states Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Christoph c/o Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | 02 /
Götze, Michael c/o Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | 03 /
Graf, Markus c/o Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Detken, Andreas Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Detken, Andreas Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 14156631.5 | 25.02.2014 | [2015/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2910413 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/56 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
B60N2/56 (EP,US);
B60N2/5678 (KR);
B60H1/00792 (US);
B60N2/58 (EP,US);
G01N19/10 (US);
B60Y2400/89 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2015/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sitzanordnung mit Temperatur- oder Feuchtigkeitssensor | [2015/35] | English: | Seat assembly with temperature or humidity sensor | [2015/35] | French: | Ensemble de siège muni d'un capteur de température ou d'humidité | [2015/35] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 02.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2343747 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,11 * the whole document * [I] 6-10,12-17; | [XI]WO0206083 (KONGSBERG AUTOMOTIVE AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-5,11 * the whole document * [I] 6-10,12-17; | [XI]DE10255441 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,11 * the whole document * [I] 6-10,12-17; | [I]DE102006017732 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [I] 1-17* the whole document * | by applicant | FR2630056 | JPH0749142 | WO02053411 | DE102007031322 | US7506924 | EP2607155 |