EP2772948 - METHOD OF TRANSFERRING SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENTS AND OF MANUFACTURING FLEXIBLE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/36] | Method for transferring semiconductor elements and for manufacturing flexible semiconductor devices | ||
[2017/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2014/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Eun-hyoung c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology San 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Choi, Jun-hee c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology San 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Sohn, Jin-seung c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology San 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Moon, Chang-youl c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology San 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Portch, Daniel, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2014/36] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 14156745.3 | 26.02.2014 | [2014/36] | Priority number, date | KR20130021383 | 27.02.2013 Original published format: KR 20130021383 | [2014/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2772948 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2772948 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2772948 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0352, H01L31/0392, H01L31/18, H01L33/00, H01L33/44, // H01L23/31, H01L27/15, H01L33/32, H01S5/02, H01S5/323 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
H01L23/3192 (EP,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
H01L33/0093 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/7806 (US);
H01L21/02343 (US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
H01L21/28 (US);
H01L21/82 (US);
H01L31/035281 (EP,US);
H01L31/03926 (EP,US);
H01L31/1848 (EP,US);
H01L31/1856 (EP,US);
H01L31/1892 (EP,US);
H01L31/1896 (EP,US);
H01L33/44 (EP,US);
H01L27/153 (EP,US);
H01L2933/0016 (EP,US);
H01L33/02 (CN,US);
H01L33/32 (EP,CN,US);
H01S5/0217 (EP,US);
H01S5/32341 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/39] | H01L33/00, H01L33/44, H01L31/0216, H01S5/028, // H01L21/56, H01L27/15, H01L33/32 | ||
Former IPC [2014/36] | H01L33/00, // H01L33/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2014/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSFER VON HALBLEITERELEMENTEN UND ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLEXIBELN HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNGEN | [2017/41] | English: | METHOD OF TRANSFERRING SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENTS AND OF MANUFACTURING FLEXIBLE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES | [2017/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT D'ÉLÉMENTS SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ET DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIFS SEMI-CONDUCTEURS FLEXIBLES | [2017/41] |
Former [2014/36] | Verfahren zur Übermittlung von Halbleiterelementen und zur Herstellung von flexibeln Halbleitervorrichtungen | ||
Former [2014/36] | Method for transferring semiconductor elements and for manufacturing flexible semiconductor devices | ||
Former [2014/36] | Procédé de transfert d'éléments semi-conducteurs et de fabrication de dispositifs semi-conducteurs flexibles | Examination procedure | 28.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 19.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2014 | AL | 11.04.2018 | AT | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | ES | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | IT | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | MK | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | RS | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | SM | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.02.2014 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4962985 (LEGRANGE JANE D [US]) [A] 1,6,7 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 19 * * column 3, lines 40-50; figure 2 * * column 4, lines 19-32; figure 4 * * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 46 *; | [A]US2004012337 (OOHATA TOYOHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,8,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 33] - [0075]; figures 1-17 *; | [A]US2009102028 (KRISHNAN SHUTESH [MY], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0006] - [0013] - [0 29] - [0038]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]FR2930839 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-5,9,10,14,15 * page 1, lines 5-12 * * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 13 * * page 5, lines 1-4 * * page 9, line 9 - page 13, line 3; figures 1A-G, 2 * * page 13, line 22 - page 16, line 6; figures 4A-C *; | [A]US2010230711 (KUO CHESTER [TW], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0048]; figures 6A-E *; | [A]US2011297994 (SUGIZAKI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,13-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0016] - [0 22] - [0025] - [0 29] , [0 30] , [0 34] , [0 41] - [0064]; figures 1, 2A-9B *; | [A]US2012222732 (CHOI JUN-HEE [KR]) [A] 1-4,9,10,14,15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 50] - [0093]; figures 1-7I * |