EP2866082 - Liquid crystal display panel and liquid crystal display device containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Road Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park Chu-Nan, Miao-Li 350 / TW | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiu, Chang-Ru No.160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Miao-Li County / TW | 02 /
Chu, Hsia-Ching No.160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Miao-Li County / TW | 03 /
Lin, Feng-Lin No.160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Miao-Li County / TW | 04 /
Chen, Li-Chun No.160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Miao-Li County / TW | 05 /
Chen, Fu-Cheng No.160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Miao-Li County / TW | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Tranter, Andrew David Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2015/18] | Application number, filing date | 14156886.5 | 26.02.2014 | [2015/18] | Priority number, date | TW20130138200 | 23.10.2013 Original published format: TW 102138200 | TW20130144385 | 04.12.2013 Original published format: TW 102144385 | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2866082 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
G02F1/133711 (EP);
G02F1/133357 (EP);
G02F1/13373 (EP);
G02F2201/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeigetafel und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung damit | [2015/18] | English: | Liquid crystal display panel and liquid crystal display device containing the same | [2015/18] | French: | Panneau à cristaux liquides et dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides le contenant | [2015/18] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2014 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 30.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 10.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH08160427 (SHARP KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-14; | [A]JP2008309832 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]JPH1130776 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |