EP2775658 - A password based security method, systems and devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Option NV Gaston Geenslaan 14 3001 Leuven / BE | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vercruysse, Jan Option NV Stosbergstraat 1 B-3052 Blanden / BE | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | IPLodge bv Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | IPLodge bvba Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | Application number, filing date | 14157411.1 | 03.03.2014 | [2014/37] | Priority number, date | GB20130003923 | 04.03.2013 Original published format: GB 201303923 | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2775658 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2775658 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L29/06 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
H04L9/3215 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (US);
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
H04L63/0838 (EP,US);
H04L9/3228 (EP,US);
H04L2463/082 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | H04L9/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Passwortbasiertes Sicherheitsverfahren, Systeme und Vorrichtungen | [2014/37] | English: | A password based security method, systems and devices | [2014/37] | French: | Systèmes, dispositifs et procédé de sécurité à base de mot | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 13.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 01.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007130463 (LAW ERIC CHUN WAH [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0081] * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP1933252 (AXALTO SA [FR]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0015] *; | [A]US2011208965 (MACHANI SALAH [CA]) [A] 1-16* paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0054] *; | [A]EP2560340 (VERITRIX INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * |