EP2846367 - Semiconductor light emitting device and method for manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2015/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akimoto, Yosuke c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Kojima, Akihiro c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Shimada, Miyoko c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Tomizawa, Hideyuki c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 05 /
Sugizaki, Yoshiaki c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 06 /
Furuyama, Hideto c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/11] | Application number, filing date | 14157438.4 | 03.03.2014 | [2015/11] | Priority number, date | JP20130184846 | 06.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013184846 | [2015/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2846367 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/50, // H01L33/00, H01L33/44, H01L33/38, H01L33/48 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
H01L33/504 (EP,US);
H01L33/52 (KR);
H01L33/50 (KR);
H01L33/505 (EP,US);
H01L33/54 (KR);
H01L2933/0041 (EP,US);
H01L2933/0091 (EP,US);
H01L33/0093 (EP,US);
H01L33/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lichtemittierendes Halbleiterbauelement und Herstellungsverfahren | [2015/11] | English: | Semiconductor light emitting device and method for manufacturing same | [2015/11] | French: | Dispositif électroluminescent semi-conducteur et son procédé de fabrication | [2015/11] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 03.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2013207141 (REIHERZER JESSE [US]) [X] 1,3,7,14,16 * paragraphs [0036] , [0042]; figures 14, 410D * [A] 2,5,6,18-20 [Y] 8-13,15,17 [I] 4; | [Y]US2011300644 (AKIMOTO YOSUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 8-13,15,17 * figure - *; | [A]US2006125133 (HUH HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 18-20 * figure 4 * |