EP2774634 - Dialysis machine with a self-supporting machine housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun Avitum AG Carl-Braun-Strasse 1 34212 Melsungen / DE | [2015/04] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states B. Braun Avitum AG Carl-Braun-Straße 1 34212 Meisungen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schäfer, Oliver Am Sprengel 12 36286 Neuenstein / DE | 02 /
Ritter, Kai-Uwe An der Maisenlach 59 b 91126 Rednitzhembach / DE | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14158126.4 | 06.03.2014 | [2014/37] | Priority number, date | DE201310102281 | 07.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013102281 | [2014/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2774634 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/37] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2774634 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2774634 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/14, A61M1/16, A61M1/34, A61M1/36 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
A61M1/14 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
A61M1/34 (EP,US);
A61M1/3624 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2014/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Dialysemaschine mit selbsttragendem Maschinengehäuse | [2014/37] | English: | Dialysis machine with a self-supporting machine housing | [2014/37] | French: | Machine de dialyse avec boîtier de machine autoporteur | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 04.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2014 | AL | 02.03.2016 | CY | 02.03.2016 | CZ | 02.03.2016 | DK | 02.03.2016 | EE | 02.03.2016 | ES | 02.03.2016 | FI | 02.03.2016 | HR | 02.03.2016 | LT | 02.03.2016 | LV | 02.03.2016 | MC | 02.03.2016 | MK | 02.03.2016 | MT | 02.03.2016 | NL | 02.03.2016 | PL | 02.03.2016 | RO | 02.03.2016 | RS | 02.03.2016 | SI | 02.03.2016 | SK | 02.03.2016 | SM | 02.03.2016 | TR | 02.03.2016 | IE | 06.03.2016 | LU | 06.03.2016 | BE | 31.03.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | BG | 02.06.2016 | NO | 02.06.2016 | GR | 03.06.2016 | IS | 02.07.2016 | PT | 04.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 06.03.2014 | |
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
MT | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
TR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.03.2016 | ||
LU | 06.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.03.2014 | |
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
MT | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MT | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6143181 (FALKVALL THORE [SE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 34-47 ** figures 1-3 *; | [XAY]US2010300945 (VINCI LUCA [IT], et al) [X] 1-6,10,11 * paragraphs [0054] , [0058] , [0060] , [0066] * * figure 4 * [A] 7-9 [Y] 3; | [Y]CH704193 (TEC SEM AG [CH]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0008] , [0016] , [0026] * * figures 4,5 * |