Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2778614 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2778614



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1453
20.11.2017 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1
24.05.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
23.06.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
09.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.06.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.06.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
09.06.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
09.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.02.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.02.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.02.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 157
10.02.2016 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 157
27.08.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
16.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
16.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
16.03.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
16.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
16.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
20.08.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
31.07.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.07.2014 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 14
31.07.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 8
31.07.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
16.07.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.06.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
11.06.2014 Priority document Search / examination 53
11.06.2014 Priority document Search / examination 114
11.06.2014 Priority document Search / examination 168
11.06.2014 Priority document Search / examination 111
11.06.2014 Priority document Search / examination 99
11.06.2014 Priority document Search / examination 179
10.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
10.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 168
21.03.2014 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
06.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
06.03.2014 Description Search / examination 101
06.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 53
06.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
06.03.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1