|
17.07.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.08.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
158 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
159 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.01.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
26.06.2015 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
114 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
171 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
111 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
99 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
179 |
|
10.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
171 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
101 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |