EP2783809 - Robot system and a method for producing a to-be-processed material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichimaru, Yuji c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | 02 /
Horiuchi, Tomoyuki c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14158290.8 | 07.03.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | JP20130052052 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013052052 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2783809 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2783809 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
B25J9/1682 (EP,US);
B25J9/1697 (US);
B25J9/1687 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Robotersystem und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines zu verarbeitenden Materials | [2014/40] | English: | Robot system and a method for producing a to-be-processed material | [2014/40] | French: | Système de robot et procédé de production d'une pièce à traiter | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 03.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004266276 (HARIKI KAZUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * figure 2 * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP2018940 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2009269110 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [Y]US2012197438 (OGAMI KAZUNORI [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] * * figure 1a * * figure 1c *; | [A] - SAKAKIBARA S ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "A TWO-ARMED INTELLIGENT ROBOT ASSEMBLES MINI ROBOTS AUTOMATICALLY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1996 IEEE IECON: 22ND. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, CONTROL, AND INSTRUMENTATION. TAIPEI, AUG. 5 - 9, 1996; [PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE IECON: INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, CONTROL, AND INSTRUM, (19960805), vol. CONF. 22, doi:10.1109/IECON.1996.570760, ISBN 978-0-7803-2776-4, pages 1879 - 1883, XP000697092 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IECON.1996.570760 | by applicant | JP2011183537 |