EP2777890 - Electric power tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2014/38] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwamura, Norihiro c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Masaki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14158710.5 | 11.03.2014 | [2014/38] | Priority number, date | JP20130049627 | 12.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013049627 | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2777890 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2777890 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
B25F5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Werkzeug | [2014/38] | English: | Electric power tool | [2014/38] | French: | Outil électrique | [2014/38] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 16.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2014 | AL | 01.06.2016 | AT | 01.06.2016 | BE | 01.06.2016 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | DK | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | ES | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | IT | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | MK | 01.06.2016 | NL | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | RS | 01.06.2016 | SE | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | SM | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 11.03.2014 | |
AL | 01.06.2016 | ||
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 11.03.2014 | |
AL | 01.06.2016 | ||
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 11.03.2014 | |
AL | 01.06.2016 | ||
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.03.2014 | |
AL | 01.06.2016 | ||
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 01.06.2016 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 01.06.2016 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1690648 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-7 * [I] 9,10; | [XI]WO2012061673 (INGERSOLL RAND CO [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [I] 9,10; | [XI]US2012235628 (OKABAYASHI HISAKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [I] 9,10; | [A]WO2006104929 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP4678199B |