EP2781193 - Insertion element and insertion device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotronik AG Ackerstrasse 6 8180 Bülach / CH | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schär, Louis Greyerzstrasse 24 3013 Bern / CH | 02 /
Fargahi, Amir Im Feld 10 8180 Bülach / CH | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Galander, Marcus Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7 - 9 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Galander, Marcus Biotronik SE & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 14159684.1 | 14.03.2014 | [2014/39] | Priority number, date | US201361802759P | 18.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361802759 P | [2014/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2781193 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02, A61B17/34, A61M25/06 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
A61M25/0074 (EP,US);
A61F2/954 (US);
A61B17/3431 (EP,US);
A61B17/3468 (EP,US);
A61M25/01 (EP,US);
A61M25/0662 (EP,US);
A61M29/00 (EP,US);
A61F2/2427 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einführelement sowie Einführvorrichtung | [2014/39] | English: | Insertion element and insertion device | [2014/39] | French: | Élément d'introduction et dispositif d'introduction | [2014/39] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 25.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/48] | 24.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0890341 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,10* figures 83a-83c *; | [X]US6383191 (ZDEBLICK THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * figures 8,9 *; | [Y]WO03090834 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [Y] 5 * figure 16 *; | [X]EP1759645 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [X] 1,10 * figures 6-9 *; | [X]US2011201894 (O'PREY CORMAC [GB], et al) [X] 1,10 * figures 3a,3b *; | [XYI]EP2455018 (STORZ KARL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,10 * figures 1,2a,2b * [Y] 5 [I] 6-9 | by applicant | US2010094392 |