EP2784577 - Projector and head-up display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1, Nakagaito Daito City Osaka Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1, Nakagaito Daito city Osaka 574-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Yutaka C/O Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1 Nakagaito Daito City Osaka Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Osha BWB 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Osha Liang SARL 32, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 14159787.2 | 14.03.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | JP20130071317 | 29.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013071317 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2784577 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/00 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
G02B27/0149 (EP,US);
G02B27/0006 (EP,US);
G03B21/005 (EP,US);
G03B21/145 (EP,US);
G03B21/2033 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0156 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] |
Former [2014/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Projektor und Head-up Anzeigegerät | [2014/40] | English: | Projector and head-up display device | [2014/40] | French: | Projecteur et dispoitif téte-haute d'affichage | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 14.12.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2011075797 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [I] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005321525 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US2012026425 (KUMAKI TAKAYA [JP]) [A] 1-8 * projector and head-up display device; paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP2085819 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * projector; paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0077]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2010033654 (AOKI NAOYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * liquid crystal display device; paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0128]; figures -19 *; | [A]WO2010010773 (RICOH KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * projectors and head-up displays; paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0194]; figures 1-29 * |