EP2743654 - Container closure delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chang, Byeong 1626 Lancaster Circle Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Roger 12230 Cherry Grove Street Moorpark, CA California 93021 / US | 02 /
Chang, Byeong Seon Integrity Bio, Inc. 820 Calle Plano Camarillo, CA 93012 / US | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/25] | 01 /
Liu, Roger 12230 Cherry Grove Street Moorpark, CA California 93021 / US | ||
02 /
Chang, Byeong 1626 Lancaster Circle Thousand Oaks, CA California 91360 / US | Representative(s) | Schlich, George Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [2014/25] | Application number, filing date | 14159997.7 | 07.03.2008 | [2014/25] | Priority number, date | US20070716223 | 09.03.2007 Original published format: US 716223 | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2743654 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2743654 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01F11/00, A61M5/315, A61J1/20, A61M5/31, A61M5/32, A61M5/34, A61M5/24 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
A61M5/31596 (EP,US);
A61J3/02 (KR);
A61M5/31 (US);
A61J1/2096 (EP,US);
A61M5/142 (KR);
A61M5/34 (EP,US);
A61M2005/312 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3128 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3132 (EP,US);
A61M2005/31598 (EP,US);
A61M5/2448 (EP,US);
A61M5/3294 (EP,US);
A61M5/345 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/25] | Title | German: | Behälterverschlussliefersystem | [2014/25] | English: | Container closure delivery system | [2014/25] | French: | Système de distribution de fermeture de récipient | [2014/25] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/46] | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08726576.5 / EP2134641 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3477432 (SHAW JOSEPH DENMAN) [X] 1,2,5,7,9 * figures 1-22 ** column 2, line 55 - column 8, line 56 *; | [X]US5569193 (HOFSTETTER JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9 * column 3, line 43 - column 10, line 37; figures 1-12 *; | [X]EP1223999 (SOD CONSEILS RECH APPLIC [FR]) [X] 1-4,7,9 * paragraph [0069]; figures 1-13 * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0121] *; | [X]US2006052747 (NISHIMURA MASATO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0115]; figures 1-25 *; | [XI]US2006144869 (CHANG BYEONG S [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-7; claim 1 * [I] 6 |