|
22.03.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
02.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
12.06.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2015 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2015 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |