Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018124475 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313827850 | 14.03.2013 | US201715825256 | 29.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110401860 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313827850 | 14.03.2013 | CN201410097449 | 14.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9866924 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2018 | B2 | US2014267911 | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313827850 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140113492 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313827850 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019175494 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313827850 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6538305B | Global Dossier | 03.07.2019 | B2 | JP2014194768 | 09.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313827850 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104053065B | Global Dossier | 02.08.2019 | B | CN104053065 | 17.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313827850 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2779672 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2014 | A3 | EP2779672 | 17.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313827850 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Divisional application | Application deemed to be withdrawn : 03.06.2020 |