EP2818918 - Active matrix structure and liquid-crystal-on-silicon display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/01] | Active matrix structure and liquid crystal display panel | ||
[2016/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Himax Display, Inc. No. 26, Zilian Road Xinshi District Tainan City 74148 / TW | [2015/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, Yuet-Wing c/o No. 26, Zilian Rd. Xinshi Dist. 74148 Tainan City / TW | 02 /
Fan-Chiang, Kuan-Hsu c/o No. 26, Zilian Rd. Xinshi Dist. 74148 Tainan City / TW | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14160226.8 | 17.03.2014 | [2015/01] | Priority number, date | US201361839874P | 27.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361839874 P | US201414205387 | 12.03.2014 Original published format: US201414205387 | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2818918 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2818918 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1362, G02F1/1343, G02F1/1335, H04N9/31 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
G02F1/134309 (EP,US);
G02F1/133553 (EP,US);
G02F1/136277 (EP,US);
G02F1/136222 (EP,US);
G02F1/136227 (EP,US);
G02F2201/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] |
Former [2015/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Aktivmatrixstruktur und LCOS-Flüssigkristallanzeigetafel | [2016/14] | English: | Active matrix structure and liquid-crystal-on-silicon display panel | [2016/14] | French: | Structure de matrice active et panneau d'affichage à cristaux liquides de type LCOS | [2016/14] |
Former [2015/01] | Aktivmatrixstruktur und Flüssigkristallanzeigetafel | ||
Former [2015/01] | Active matrix structure and liquid crystal display panel | ||
Former [2015/01] | Structure de matrice active et panneau d'affichage à cristaux liquides | Examination procedure | 17.03.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 28.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2014 | AL | 24.05.2017 | AT | 24.05.2017 | CY | 24.05.2017 | CZ | 24.05.2017 | DK | 24.05.2017 | EE | 24.05.2017 | ES | 24.05.2017 | FI | 24.05.2017 | HR | 24.05.2017 | IT | 24.05.2017 | LT | 24.05.2017 | LV | 24.05.2017 | MC | 24.05.2017 | MK | 24.05.2017 | PL | 24.05.2017 | PT | 24.05.2017 | RO | 24.05.2017 | RS | 24.05.2017 | SE | 24.05.2017 | SI | 24.05.2017 | SK | 24.05.2017 | SM | 24.05.2017 | TR | 24.05.2017 | BG | 24.08.2017 | NO | 24.08.2017 | GR | 25.08.2017 | IS | 24.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.03.2014 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PT | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 17.03.2014 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PT | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]US8416373 (LI YUET-WING [TW], et al) [XD] 1,3,4,10,11,13,14,20 * figures 1-5 * * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 38 * * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 49 * [Y] 7,9,17,19 [I] 5,6,15,16; | [XYI]US2006109412 (HSIAO SHU-CHAN [TW], et al) [X] 1,3,4,10,11,13,14,20 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * [Y] 7,9,17,19 [I] 8,18; | [XY]JP2010060901 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-4,10-14,20 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0071] * [Y] 7,17; | [Y]US2006221267 (BELL CYNTHIA [US], et al) [Y] 7,17 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0028] *; | [Y]US2008303993 (KUO CHIEN-CHUNG [TW], et al) [Y] 9,19 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053]; table 1 * | Examination | US2005140893 | by applicant | US8416373 |