EP2898779 - Edible pet chew with gluten free outer layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wenzhou Yuxiang Pet Product Co., Ltd. No. 75 Fuyang Road East PingYang County Shuitou Town Wenzhou, Zhejiang 325405 / CN | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Zuxi No. 15 North Dan Hua Road, Shuitou Town, Pingyang County 325405 Wenzhou / CN | 02 /
Chen, Zuhua No. 7 North Dan Hua Road, Shuitou Town, Pingyang County 325405 Wenzhou / CN | 03 /
Chen, Xiang No. 15 North Dan Hua Road, Shuitou Town, Pingyang County 325405 Wenzhou / CN | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Reichert & Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Prüfeninger Straße 21 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Reichert & Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Bismarckplatz 8 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14160619.4 | 19.03.2014 | [2015/31] | Priority number, date | US201414166491 | 28.01.2014 Original published format: US201414166491 | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2898779 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/00, A23K1/14, A23K1/18 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
A23K10/20 (EP,US);
A23K10/26 (US);
A23K10/30 (EP,US);
A23K50/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Essbares Kauprodukt für Haustiere mit glutenfreier Außenschicht | [2015/31] | English: | Edible pet chew with gluten free outer layer | [2015/31] | French: | Produit à mâcher pour animaux de compagnie avec une couche extérieure sans gluten | [2015/31] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2014 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 29.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 05.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19501142 (OLBERTS MARKUS [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 36 - line 40; claims 1,10 *; | [A]US2005233038 (WEINBERG CHRISTOPHER A [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006]; figure 5; claims 1,8,9 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0039] *; | [A]EP1692946 (MARS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005]; claims 1,2,11 * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0090] *; | [A]US2010040745 (CAPODIECI ROBERTO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0010]; examples 2-4, 10-12 *; | [A]US2012234259 (XU GUANGQIANG [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002]; figures 11,17,21 * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074] ** paragraph [0081] *; | [I]US2013133588 (CHEN ZUXI [CN], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006]; figure 1; claims 1-4,6-8, 11,12 * * paragraph [0014] *; | [A] - CHANDLER M, "ESSENTIALS OF NUTRITION IN DOGS AND CATS WITH GASTROINTESTINAL DISEASE", IN PRACTICE, BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION, LONDON, GB, (20021001), vol. 24, no. 9, ISSN 0263-841X, pages 528 - 533, XP009077636 [A] 1-15 * page 529, column right, line 18 - line 31 * | [A] - GUILDFORD W G, "Nutritional management of gastrointestinal tract diseases of dogs and cats", THE JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR NUTRITION, US, (19940101), vol. 124, no. 12s, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 2663S - 2669s, XP009015863 [A] 1-15 * page 2666S, column left, line 14 - line 23 * | by applicant | US5673673 | US7677203 | US2012234259 | US8449937 |