Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014093380 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213644130 | 03.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10677217 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2020 | B2 | US2014112780 | 24.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213644130 | 03.10.2012 | US201314145257 | 31.12.2013 | US201313852241 | 28.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2716906 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2018 | A3 | EP2716906 | 09.04.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213644130 | 03.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013231165B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2017 | B2 | AU2013231165 | 17.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213644130 | 03.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2828512 | 03.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213644130 | 03.10.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9670900 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2017 | B2 | US2014294595 | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313852241 | 28.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2784301 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2018 | B1 | EP2784301 | 01.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313852241 | 28.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2784301T | 12.03.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201313852241 | 28.03.2013 |