EP2921184 - Finishing plaster having improved tolerability and a long adhesive period and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme AG Lohmannstrasse 2 56626 Andernach / DE | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ritzdorf, Gerhard Hauptstrasse 46 D-56598 Hammerstein / DE | 02 /
Hille, Thomas, Dr. Steinstrasse 39 D-56567 Neuwied / DE | 03 /
Botzem, Petra Martinsbergstrasse 40 D-56626 Andernach / DE | 04 /
Wauer, Gabriel, Dr. Albert-Federle-Strasse 8 D-53474 Ahrweller / DE | 05 /
Fuhrmann, Marlene Gartenstrasse 13 D-56829 Kail / DE | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2015/39] | Application number, filing date | 14160657.4 | 19.03.2014 | [2015/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2921184 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/34, A61L15/58, A61K9/70 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
A61K9/7061 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/7084 (EP);
A61L15/34 (EP,CN,US);
A61L15/58 (EP,CN,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/58, C08L23/20 (CN,EP,US);
A61L15/58, C08L33/02 (US,CN,EP);
A61L15/58, C08L35/06 (US,CN,EP);
A61L15/58, C08L43/04 (US,CN,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Überpflaster mit verbesserter Verträglichkeit und einer langen Haftungsdauer und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2015/39] | English: | Finishing plaster having improved tolerability and a long adhesive period and method for producing the same | [2015/39] | French: | Pansement de recouvrement à tolérance améliorée et longue durée d'adhérence et son procédé de fabrication | [2015/39] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0247571 (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-16* claim - *; | [A]WO0238136 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 7, lines 22-30 * * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 30 * * page 22, lines 10-23 * * claim - *; | [A]WO2006036899 (CORIUM INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 12, paragraphs 58-62 * * claim - *; | [A]DE102004038285 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * page 5, paragraphs 17-19 * * page 29, paragraphs 184-187 * * page 30, paragraph 195 *; | [A]DE102006054731 (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE]) [A] 1-16 * claim - *; | [I]EP1992363 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [I] 1-16 * page 4, paragraphs 12-13 * * page 6, paragraphs 23-29 * * example - * * claim - * | by applicant | WO8707164 | US2009130190 | US2011144470 | - HEILMANN, KLAUS, Therapeutische Systeme Konzept und Realisation programmierter Arzneiverabreichung, FERDINAND ENKE VERLAG, (1984), page 26 | - ROBERTS, J. DRUGS DERMATOL., (200805), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 452 - 456 | - ROBERT, DERMATOL. CLIN., (200910), vol. 27, no. 4, pages 529 - 533 |