Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11583505 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2023 | B2 | US2019262278 | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14160657 | 19.03.2014 | WO2015EP00579 | 16.03.2015 | US201615126701 | 16.09.2016 | US201916406254 | 08.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10335377 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2019 | B2 | US2017087098 | 30.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14160657 | 19.03.2014 | WO2015EP00579 | 16.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6698540B | Global Dossier | 27.05.2020 | B2 | JP2017511174 | 20.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14160657 | 19.03.2014 | WO2015EP00579 | 16.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3119444 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2019 | B1 | EP3119444 | 25.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14160657 | 19.03.2014 | WO2015EP00579 | 16.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106255497 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14160657 | 19.03.2014 | WO2015EP00579 | 16.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016021371 | 01.12.2020 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP14160657 | 19.03.2014 | WO2015EP00579 | 16.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2943003 | 24.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14160657 | 19.03.2014 | WO2015EP00579 | 16.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2748243T | 16.03.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP14160657 | 19.03.2014 | WO2015EP00579 | 16.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015139830 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14160657 | 19.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2921184 | Global Dossier | 23.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14160657 | 19.03.2014 |