EP2781446 - Automatic cycle-storage system and battery for such a system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JCDecaux SA 17, rue Soyer 92200 Neuilly-Sur-Seine / FR | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tavernier, Patrick 7 promenade Venezia 78000 VERSAILLES / FR | 02 /
Hoden, Cyril 26bis voie romaine 78950 GAMBAIS / FR | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14160678.0 | 19.03.2014 | [2014/39] | Priority number, date | FR20130052536 | 21.03.2013 Original published format: FR 1352536 | [2014/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2781446 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B62M6/40, B62M6/90, B62H5/00 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
B62M6/40 (EP,US);
B60L50/20 (EP);
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L53/305 (EP,US);
B60L53/65 (EP);
B60L53/665 (EP);
B62H5/00 (EP);
B62M6/90 (EP);
B60L2200/12 (EP);
B62H2003/005 (EP);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
H02J7/0018 (EP,US);
H02J7/0042 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Automatisches System zur Speicherung von Zyklen, und Batterie für ein solches System | [2014/39] | English: | Automatic cycle-storage system and battery for such a system | [2014/39] | French: | Système automatique de stockage de cycles et batterie pour un tel système | [2019/01] |
Former [2014/39] | Système automatique de stockage de cycles et batterie pour un tel système. | Examination procedure | 10.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05316606 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | [I]JP2005196403 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * column 5 - column 5 *; | [X]US2010228405 (MORGAL RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0152]; figures 1,12,17-19,23 *; | [I]US2011148346 (GAGOSZ JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [I] 1-13 * column 173 - column 188 * * column 189 - column 191 ** figures 19,34 * | by applicant | EP1820722 |