EP2891849 - Heat reclaim for a multifunction heat pump and a multifunction air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states O.Y.L. Research & Development Centre Sdn Bhd Lot 60334, Persiaran Rahman Putra 3 Taman Perindustrian Bukit Rahman Putra 47000 Sungai Buloh Selangor Darul Ehsan / MY | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hong Hong, Poh O.Y.L Research & Development Centre SDN BHD C/o Lot 60334, Persiaran Rahman Putra 3, Taman Perindustrian Bukit Rahman Putra 47000 Sg. Buloh Selangor Darul Ehsan / MY | 02 /
Bin Mohamad, Zulaidi O.Y.L Research & Development Centre SDN BHD C/o Lot 60334, Persiaran Rahman Putra 3, Taman Perindustrian Bukit Rahman Putra 47000 Sg. Buloh Selangor Darul Ehsan / MY | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | HGF Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | Application number, filing date | 14160810.9 | 20.03.2014 | [2015/28] | Priority number, date | MY20130070136 | 02.08.2013 Original published format: MY 1370136 | [2015/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2891849 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F25B13/00 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP);
F25B2313/003 (EP);
F25B2313/021 (EP);
F25B2313/02742 (EP);
F25B2339/047 (EP);
F25B2700/2104 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wärmerückgewinnung für eine Multifunktionswärmepumpe und Multifunktionsklimaanlage | [2015/28] | English: | Heat reclaim for a multifunction heat pump and a multifunction air conditioner | [2015/28] | French: | Récupération de chaleur pour pompe à chaleur multifonction et climatiseur d'air multifonction | [2015/28] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2014 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 09.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 17.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/29] | Divisional application(s) | EP15191499.1 / EP3001123 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]AU2010100284 (VAST VISION LTD) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011214437 (JEONG DONG WOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]CN101504212 (BRIGHT AIR CONDITIONING CO LTD [CN]) [AD] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]US6378318 (JIN KEUM SU [KR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | CN101231053 | CN101504211 | CN101504212 | CN201043824Y | CN201028886Y |