EP2784049 - Honeycomb structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Yoshio c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd., Legal Affairs & Intellectual Property Dept. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
Hidaka, Kenichi c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd., Legal Affairs & Intellectual Property Dept. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2020/50] |
Former [2014/40] | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 14161128.5 | 21.03.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | JP20130075211 | 29.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013075211 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2784049 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2784049 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2784049 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C04B37/00, C04B38/00 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
C04B37/005 (EP,US);
B01J27/224 (US);
C04B38/0019 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] |
Former [2014/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Wabenstruktur | [2014/40] | English: | Honeycomb structure | [2014/40] | French: | Structure en nid d'abeille | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 23.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2014 | AL | 09.12.2020 | AT | 09.12.2020 | CY | 09.12.2020 | CZ | 09.12.2020 | DK | 09.12.2020 | EE | 09.12.2020 | ES | 09.12.2020 | FI | 09.12.2020 | HR | 09.12.2020 | IT | 09.12.2020 | LT | 09.12.2020 | LV | 09.12.2020 | MC | 09.12.2020 | MK | 09.12.2020 | MT | 09.12.2020 | NL | 09.12.2020 | PL | 09.12.2020 | RO | 09.12.2020 | RS | 09.12.2020 | SE | 09.12.2020 | SI | 09.12.2020 | SK | 09.12.2020 | SM | 09.12.2020 | BG | 09.03.2021 | NO | 09.03.2021 | GR | 10.03.2021 | GB | 21.03.2021 | IE | 21.03.2021 | LU | 21.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | FR | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | IS | 09.04.2021 | PT | 09.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.03.2014 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
MK | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
GB | 21.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 21.03.2014 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
GB | 21.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 21.03.2014 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
GB | 21.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
GB | 21.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
GB | 21.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
GB | 21.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
GB | 21.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1142619 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP2374773 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]JP2012031738 (TOKYO YOGYO KK); | [A]EP2511250 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP2554265 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2011098866 | JP2012188958 |