EP2784873 - Terminal including multiband antenna using conductive border [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pantech Inc. Pantech Bldg. 179 Seongam-Ro Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | [2017/14] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states Pantech Co., Ltd. Pantech Bldg. I-2, DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-792 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoo, Kyoung Sang PANTECH Bldg., I-2, DMC, Sangam-dong, Mapo-gu 121-792 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kang, Myung Gu PANTECH Bldg., I-2, DMC, Sangam-dong, Mapo-gu 121-792 Seoul / KR | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14161640.9 | 26.03.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | KR20130034406 | 29.03.2013 Original published format: KR 20130034406 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2784873 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q5/00, H01Q7/00, H01Q9/42, H01Q21/28 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q5/10 (KR);
H01Q1/22 (KR);
H01Q1/48 (KR);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01Q5/371 (EP,US);
H01Q5/378 (EP,US);
H01Q7/00 (EP,US);
H01Q9/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] |
Former [2014/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Endgerät mit Mehrbandantenne mit einer leitenden Begrenzung | [2014/40] | English: | Terminal including multiband antenna using conductive border | [2014/40] | French: | Terminal incluant une antenne multibande utilisant une bordure conductrice | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 31.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 10.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2017 | 31.03.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 17.03.2016 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2016/47] | 01.03.2017 | Resumption of proceedings | [2017/06] | 17.03.2016 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2017/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012229347 (JIN NANBO [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0078]; figures 6,7 *; | [X]US2004257283 (ASANO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-15 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049]; figures 8-10 *; | [X]US2010053002 (WOJACK JASON P [US], et al) [X] 10-13 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2511979 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0027]; figures 2A,B * |